Dworatzek, Lucian Gregor (CPSO#: 19078)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Aug 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 27, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Dworatzek has resigned from practice and voluntarily agreed not to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.