Dwyer, Kevin Charles James Joseph (CPSO#: 23861)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brantford Medical Centre Suite 100 40 Shellington Place Brantford, ON N3S 0C5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014