Dy Pac, Emily Tan (CPSO#: 33664)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Fukien

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospitals, 425 Algonquin Boulevard East, Timmins, ON, P4N 1B5. 700 Ross Avenue East, Timmins, ON, P4N 8P2
Date Received: 24 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 2016