Dyal, Ruth Elaine (CPSO#: 53578)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992