Dyamenahalli, Umesh (CPSO#: 67664)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006