Dyba, Janique Larysa (CPSO#: 103894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANIQUE LARYSA DYBA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DYBA is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. DYBA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DYBA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DYBA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DYBA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DYBA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018