Dyck, Erin Danielle (CPSO#: 68799)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 1995 to 02 Dec 1995
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 1995