Dyck, Helmut Henry (CPSO#: 19530)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994