Dyck, John Daryl (CPSO#: 53554)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012