Dye-Torrington, Debra Angelia (CPSO#: 86159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Subspecialty Clinic
2025 Midland Avenue East
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 341-3832
Fax: (647) 341-3830
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 348-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA ANGELIA DYE-TORRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYE-TORRINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011