Dyer, Cinda Robin (CPSO#: 54067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1407 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 1Y7
Phone: (416) 922-6699
Fax: (416) 922-7250
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDA ROBIN DYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 May 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 May 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Oct 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Oct 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986