Dyer, John Ramsay (CPSO#: 25698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Dec 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001