Dyke, George William Arthur (CPSO#: 43779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G.W.A. Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014