Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dykeman, Ronald Wade (CPSO#: 68832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Occupational Health Department
General Motors of Canada
1908 Colonel Sam Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 8P7
Phone: (905) 644-3737
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Occupational Health Department
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto ON
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD WADE DYKEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYKEMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2000