Dymon, William Andrew (CPSO#: 21937)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 29 May 2017


Address: Record Storage and Retreival Services 111St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y7 Phone: 416 398 0638 or 1 888 563 3732 Fax: 416 398 5932
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 16 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017