Dzaja, Nancy (CPSO#: 86963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 265-7477
Fax: (519) 265-6006
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lin Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lin ( CPSO# 86947 )
Dr. N. Dzaja ( CPSO# 86963 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6420

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
430 McNeily Road
Suite 201
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 5E3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
89 Dawson Road
Suite 208
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-7477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY DZAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2012