Dzavik, Vladimir (CPSO#: 60151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
6 E N - 246
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6265
Fax: (416) 340-3390
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5141
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vladimir Dzavik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dzavik ( CPSO# 60151 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital - Division of Cardiology
200 Elizabeth Street
6EN-246
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VLADIMIR DZAVIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAVIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000