Dziedzic, Malgorzata (CPSO#: 67044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4037
Fax: (416) 521-4093
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7598
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA DZIEDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZIEDZIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997