Dzongowski, Petros (CPSO#: 64985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone: (519) 659-3747
Fax: (519) 659-8575
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dzongowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dzongowski ( CPSO# 64985 )

Business Address:
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-3747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETROS DZONGOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZONGOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993