Dzwonkowski, Peter (CPSO#: 60512)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998