Eakins, Thomas Stephen Garvin (CPSO#: 26047)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Eakins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012