Eapen, Tamina Susan (CPSO#: 84790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 416-435-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamina Eapen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Eapen ( CPSO# 84790 )

Business Address:
C A M H
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 435-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMINA SUSAN EAPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAPEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011