Eapen-John, Reena Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Benin, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
165 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N6
Phone: (905) 803-0078
Fax: (905) 803-0078
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA ELIZABETH EAPEN-JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAPEN-JOHN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993