Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Eappen, Roy (CPSO#: 61835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
484 Avenue Road
Apartment 604
Toronto ON  M4V 2J4
Phone: (416) 928-1464
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROY EAPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAPPEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1989