Earle, Craig Christopher (CPSO#: 62233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue Room G 106
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4757
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG CHRISTOPHER EARLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EARLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008