Earle, Lynda Mavis Maureen (CPSO#: 76138)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Public Health Effective: 03 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2011