Easo, Hyacinth Sarah Eapen (CPSO#: 80797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: John, Hyacinth Sarah Eapen (used until: 05 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital Freeport Site
P O Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7013
Fax: (519) 894-8308
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hyacinth Easo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Easo ( CPSO# 80797 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Freeport Site
PO Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 841-4132

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HYACINTH SARAH EAPEN EASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009