Easson, Alexandra Maria (CPSO#: 63690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgical Oncology
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 6th floor Room 6-723
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2328
Fax: (416) 946-4429
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Easson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Easson ( CPSO# 63690 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Rm 3-124 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA MARIA EASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992