Easterbrook, William Michael (CPSO#: 22726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 926-1486
Fax: (416) 926-0091
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Easterbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Easterbrook ( CPSO# 22726 )

Business Address:
310 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 926-1486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MICHAEL EASTERBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASTERBROOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970