Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Eaton, Douglas Henry (CPSO#: 20951)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1994