Ebeid, Manal William (CPSO#: 87391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 197
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 493-0346
Fax: (416) 493-0336
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Salib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ebeid ( CPSO# 87391 )
Dr. A. Salib ( CPSO# 83042 )

Business Address:
197 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 493-0346

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAL WILLIAM EBEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBEID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009