Eberhard, Barbara Anne (CPSO#: 60369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNE EBERHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBERHARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1995