Eby, Roberta Jane (CPSO#: 55545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 38510
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington, Ontario
L7S 1W7
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

O A T C Brampton
14 Nelson Street
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 450-6679
Fax: (905) 450-7741
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. RJ Eby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Eby ( CPSO# 55545 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
O A T C Brampton
14 Nelson Street
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 450-6679

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA JANE EBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986