Ecclestone, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 20871)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1992
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jul 2001
Summary:

 On July 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Ecclestone(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with regard to conduct that was considered to be disgraceful, 
 dishonourable and unprofessional relating to improper sexual conduct and communications by Dr. 
 Ecclestone with two females who were attending him to obtain approval for OHIP funding for medical 
 procedures.  

The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1)	Dr. Ecclestone be reprimanded 
 and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 	Register
2)	Dr. Ecclestone(s certificate of 
 registration be revoked
3)	Dr. Ecclestone pay the costs of $1,250.00 to the College

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2001


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Feb 1992
Summary:

In February 1992, Dr. Ecclestone pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as 
defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
impropriety with a patient.   The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. 
Ecclestone guilty of professional misconduct.   Consequently, the Committee imposed the 
following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Ecclestone was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
      the Register. 
 
   2. The following restrictions and conditions were to be placed on Dr. Ecclestone s licence to 
      practice medicine: 
 
      (a) Dr. Ecclestone was to have no involvement in clinical contact or care of patients; 
 
      (b) Dr. Ecclestone was not to prescribe medications for others or himself; and 
 
      (c) Continuance of Dr. Ecclestone s licence was to be dependent upon his continuing in 
          therapy with his current psychiatrist or another psychotherapist acceptable to the 
          Registrar; further, he was to direct his psychotherapist to provide semi-annual 
          reports to the Registrar. 
 
   3. The Committee imposed the following further conditions upon Dr. Ecclestone s licence: 
 
      (a) Dr. Ecclestone was to be prohibited from applying for a variation of these 
          conditions for a period of one year from the date upon which this decision became 
          final; 
 
      (b) Any application to so vary was to be made to the present or another panel of the 
          Discipline Committee; 
 
      (c) The record of the present proceedings was to form part of any future application to 
          vary these conditions upon Dr. Ecclestone s licence; and 
 
      (d) Any future application to remove these conditions was to be accompanied by an 
          independent psychiatric assessment of Dr. Ecclestone s course of therapy which was 
          to offer an opinion as to its success in ensuring to a substantive degree of medical 
          and psychological certainty that he posed no danger to future patients. 
 
Subsequently, in June 1993, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. Ecclestone s application to vary 
conditions.   In a decision dated 1 September 1993, the Committee ordered that the following 
terms and conditions be imposed on Dr. Ecclestone s licence to practice: 
 
   1. Dr. Ecclestone was to be allowed to return to clinical practice but a third adult person was 
      to be present whenever he was in the presence of a female patient; 
 
   2. Dr. Ecclestone was not to prescribe medications for himself; 
 
   3. The ongoing reports from Dr. Ecclestone s therapist to the Registrar were to include an 
      opinion regarding the impact of his graduated return to clinical practice upon his 
      continuing therapy; and 
 
   4. All other restrictions and conditions placed upon Dr. Ecclestone s licence to practice were 
      to continue in full force and effect. 
 
Subsequently, in May 1995, the Discipline Committee heard a further application by Dr. 
Ecclestone to vary conditions of the original February 1992 order with regard to the ongoing 
need for therapeutic support or semi-annual reports to the Registrar should no longer be a 
requirement of the College.  The Committee granted the motion to remove the following: 
 
   2. (c) Continuance of Dr. Ecclestone s licence was to be dependent upon his continuing in 
          therapy with his current psychiatrist or another psychotherapist acceptable to the 
          Registrar; further, he was to direct his psychotherapist to provide semi-annual 
          reports to the Registrar. (Order of February 1992). 
 
All other restrictions and conditions placed on Dr. Ecclestone s certificate shall continue in full 
force and effect. 
 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Feb 1992