Ecker, George Andrew (CPSO#: 59568)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002