Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Eckler, Howard Brian (CPSO#: 21324)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard B. Eckler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013