Eddeb, Abdurrahman Ali (CPSO#: 68659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 63517
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Eddeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2009


Corporation Name: A.A. Eddeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Eddeb ( CPSO# 68659 )
Dr. I. Ammura ( CPSO# 68671 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN ALI EDDEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDDEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000