Eddy, Richard James (CPSO#: 56186)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987