Edelson, Jeffrey Daniel (CPSO#: 32454)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2016