Edelstein, Jerome (CPSO#: 63954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone: (416) 256-5614
Fax: (416) 256-4194
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elements
195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: 416 929 1618
Fax: 416 929 0736
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Forest Hill Plastic Surgery
1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-7864
Fax: (416) 785-7207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerome Edelstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Edelstein ( CPSO# 63954 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1099

Business Address:
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone Number: (416) 256-5614

Business Address:
1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 785-7864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME EDELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992