Edgar, John Patrick (CPSO#: 22171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013