Edgecombe, Allison Diane (CPSO#: 86283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of Chief Medical Examiner
4070 Bowness Rd NW
Calgary AB  T3B 3R7
Phone: 403-297-8123

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON DIANE EDGECOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDGECOMBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2013