Edington, Richard Bruce (CPSO#: 33587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1982

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Bruce Grey Health Centre
21 McGivern Street
P O Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: (519) 881-1220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Hanover And District Hospital
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (519) 364-2340
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Bruce Edington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Edington ( CPSO# 33587 )

Business Address:
118 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD BRUCE EDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On February 20, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Richard B Edington in respect of an incident that took place in December 2008.