Edington, Robert David (CPSO#: 65024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Edington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Edington ( CPSO# 65024 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DAVID EDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2002