Edirisinghe, Manorie (CPSO#: 62213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The West End Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-9230
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Edirisinghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edirisinghe ( CPSO# 62213 )

Business Address:
The West End Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANORIE EDIRISINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDIRISINGHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1991