Edmondson, Nadeen Veloria (CPSO#: 79745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Dept of Pathology & Laboratory Med
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845 2571 Ext. 6277
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadeen Edmondson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Edmondson ( CPSO# 79745 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADEEN VELORIA EDMONDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008