Edris, Fawaz Edeeb (CPSO#: 80157)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007