Edstrom, Karen Diane (CPSO#: 66373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone: (905) 628-3376
Fax: (905) 628-8833
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Edstrom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Edstrom ( CPSO# 66373 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 628-3376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DIANE EDSTROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDSTROM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000