Edward, Raouf Khalil Abdallah (CPSO#: 63153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Abdallah, Raouf Edward Khalil (used until: 28 Oct 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2160 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X6
Phone: (416) 243-5091
Fax: (416) 243-8374
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Edward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Edward ( CPSO# 63153 )

Business Address:
102 - 2160 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 243-5091

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAOUF KHALIL ABDALLAH EDWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 19 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996