Edwards, Carla Diane (CPSO#: 75134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Sport + Mental Health
Unit 202
511 Edinburgh Rd S
Guelph ON  N1G 4S5
Phone: 519-837-1228
Fax: 519-763-9096
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

David Braley Sport Medicine Center
DBAC WB127
1280 Main St E
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 23575
Fax: 905-526-7397
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Health and Performance Centre
University of Guelph
J.T. Powell Building, 2nd floor
50 Stone Road West
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-767-5011 Ext. 1
Fax: 519-821-4007
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Elliott Sports Medicine Clinic
102-1100 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Canada
Phone: 905-336-3340
Fax: 905-336-6095
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carla Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Edwards ( CPSO# 75134 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Athletics and Rec
1280 Main Street
DBAC WB127
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
202 - 511 Edinburgh Road South
Guelph ON  N1G 4S5
Phone Number: (519) 837-1228

Business Address:
JT Powell Building
Level 2
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 767-5011

Business Address:
102 - 1100 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone Number: (905) 336-3340

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA DIANE EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005